Advertisements

## To calculate reminder on dividing the number by 27 and 37

### Let me explain this rule by taking examples

consider number 34568276, we have to calculate the reminder on diving this number by 27 and 37 respectively.

make triplets as written below starting from units place

34.........568..........276

now sum of all triplets = 34+568+276 = 878

divide it by 27 we get reminder as 14

divide it by 37 we get reminder as 27-
## Example.

other examples for the clarification of the rule

let the number is 2387850765

triplets are 2...387...850...765

sum of the triplets = 2+387+850+765 = 2004

on revising the steps we get

2......004

sum = 6

divide it by 27 we get reminder as 6

divide it by 37 we get reminder as 6 -
Is this maths trick helpful? (10243) (4188)
**Post / Read comment (38)**

Advertisements

## To calculate reminder on dividing the number by 7 11 and 13

### Let me explain this rule by taking examples

consider number 34568276, we have to calculate the reminder on diving this number by 7 11 and 13 respectively.

make triplets as written below starting from units place

34.........568..........276

now alternate sum = 34+276 = 310 and 568

and difference of these sums = 568-310 = 258

divide it by 7 we get reminder as 6

divide it by 11 we get reminder as 5

divide it by 13 we get reminder as 11-
## Example.

other examples:-

consider the number 4523895099854

triplet pairs are 4...523...895...099...854

alternate sums are 4+895+854=1753 and 523+099=622

difference = 1131

revise the same tripling process

1......131

so difference = 131-1 = 130

divide it by 7 we get reminder as 4

divide it by 11 we get reminder as 9

divide it by 13 we get reminder as 0 -
Is this maths trick helpful? (4043) (1666)
**Post / Read comment (12)**

## To calculate reminder on dividing the number by 3

### Method:- first calculate the digit sum , then divide it by 3, the reminder in this case will be the required reminder

example:- 1342568

let the number is as written above

its digit sum = 29 = 11 = 2

so reminder will be 2-
## Example.

Take some others

34259677858

digit sum of the number is 64 = 10 = 1

reminder is 1

similarly let the number is 54670329845

then digit sum = 53 = 8

when we divide 8 by 3 we get reminder as 2 so answer will be 2 -
Is this maths trick helpful? (2732) (953)
**Post / Read comment (4)**

Advertisements

## To calculate reminder on dividing the number by 3

### Method:- first calculate the digit sum , then divide it by 3, the reminder in this case will be the required reminder

example:- 1342568

let the number is as written above

its digit sum = 29 = 11 = 2

so reminder will be 2-
## Example.

Take some others

34259677858

digit sum of the number is 64 = 10 = 1

reminder is 1

similarly let the number is 54670329845

then digit sum = 53 = 8

when we divide 8 by 3 we get reminder as 2 so answer will be 2 -
Is this maths trick helpful? (1688) (738)
**Post / Read comment (1)**

## To calculate reminder on dividing the number by 3

### Method:- first calculate the digit sum , then divide it by 3, the reminder in this case will be the required reminder

example:- 1342568

let the number is as written above

its digit sum = 29 = 11 = 2

so reminder will be 2-
## Example.

Take some others

34259677858

digit sum of the number is 64 = 10 = 1

reminder is 1

similarly let the number is 54670329845

then digit sum = 53 = 8

when we divide 8 by 3 we get reminder as 2 so answer will be 2 -
Is this maths trick helpful? (1421) (648)
**Post / Read comment (3)**

## Square of numbers near to 100

### Let me explain this rule by taking examples

96^2 :-

First calculate 100-96, it is 4

so 96^2 = (96-4)----4^2 = 9216

similarly

106^2 :-

First calculate 106-100, it is 6

so 106^2 = (106+6)----6^2 = 11236-
## Example.

An other case arises

110^2 = (110+10)----100 = (120+1)----00 = 12100

similarly

89^2 = (89-11)----121 = (78+1)----21 = 7921 -
Is this maths trick helpful? (3331) (1111)
**Post / Read comment (18)**

## Square of any 2 digit number

### Let me explain this trick by taking examples

67^2 = [6^2][7^2]+20*6*7 = 3649+840 = 4489

similarly

25^2 = [2^2][5^2]+20*2*5 = 425+200 = 625

Take one more example

97^2 = [9^2][7^2]+20*9*7 = 8149+1260 = 9409

Here [] is not an operation, it is only a separation between initial 2 and last 2 digits-
## Example.

Here an extra case arises

Consider the following examples for that

91^2 = [9^2][1^2]+20*9*1 = 8101+180 = 8281 -
Is this maths trick helpful? (3694) (1224)
**Post / Read comment (35)**

## Multiplication of 2 two-digit numbers where the first digit of both the numbers are same and the last digit of the two numbers sum to 10 (You canâ€™t use this rule for other numbers)

### Let me explain this rule by taking examples

To calculate 56Ã—54:

Multiply 5 by 5+1. So, 5*6 = 30. Write down 30.

Multiply together the last digits: 6*4 = 24. Write down 24.

The product of 56 and 54 is thus 3024.-
## Example.

Understand the rule by 1 more example

78*72 = [7*(7+1)][8*2] = 5616 -
Is this maths trick helpful? (2049) (693)
**Post / Read comment (16)**

## Multiplication of two numbers that differ by 6 (This trick only works if you have memorized or can quickly calculate the squares of numbers.

### If the two numbers differ by 6 then their product is the square of their average minus 9.

Let me explain this rule by taking examples

10*16 = 13^2 - 9 = 160

22*28 = 25^2 - 9 = 616-
## Example.

Understand the rule by 1 more example

997*1003 = 1000^2 - 9 = 999991 -
Is this maths trick helpful? (1330) (596)
**Post / Read comment (2)**

## Multiplication of two numbers that differ by 4 (This trick only works if you have memorized or can quickly calculate the squares of numbers.

### If two numbers differ by 4, then their product is the square of the number in the middle (the average of the two numbers) minus 4.

Let me explain this rule by taking examples

22*26 = 24^2 - 4 = 572

98*102 = 100^2 - 4 = 9996-
## Example.

Understand the rule by 1 more example

148*152 = 150^2 - 4 = 22496 -
Is this maths trick helpful? (1030) (451)
**Post / Read comment (1)**

## Multiplication of two numbers that differ by 2 (This trick only works if you have memorized or can quickly calculate the squares of numbers.

### When two numbers differ by 2, their product is always the square of the number in between these numbers minus 1.

Let me explain this rule by taking examples

18*20 = 19^2 - 1 = 361 - 1 = 360

25*27 = 26^2 - 1 = 676 - 1 = 675-
## Example.

Understand the rule by 1 more example

49*51 = 50^2 - 1 = 2500 - 1 = 2499 -
Is this maths trick helpful? (975) (354)
**Post / Read comment (0)**

## Multiplication of 125 with any number (You can't use this rule for other numbers)

### Let me explain this rule by taking examples

1. 93*125 = 93000/8 = 11625.

2. 137*125 = 137000/8 = 17125.-
## Example.

Understand the rule by 1 more example

3786*125 = 3786000/8 = 473250. -
Is this maths trick helpful? (1260) (509)
**Post / Read comment (2)**

## Multiplication of 25 with any number (You can't use this rule for other numbers)

### Let me explain this rule by taking examples

1. 67*25 = 6700/4 = 1675.

2. 298*25 = 29800/4 = 7450.-
## Example.

Understand the rule by 1 more example

5923*25 = 592300/4 = 148075. -
Is this maths trick helpful? (1157) (440)
**Post / Read comment (3)**

## Multiplication of 5 with any number (You can't use this rule for other numbers)

### Let me explain this rule by taking examples

1. 49*5 = 490/2 = 245.

2. 453*5 = 4530/2 = 2265.-
## Example.

Understand the rule by 1 more example

5649*5 = 56490/2 = 28245. -
Is this maths trick helpful? (1106) (354)
**Post / Read comment (1)**

## Multiplication of 5 with any number (You can't use this rule for other numbers)

### Let me explain this rule by taking examples

1. 49*5 = 490/2 = 245.

2. 453*5 = 4530/2 = 2265.-
## Example.

Understand the rule by 1 more example

5649*5 = 56490/2 = 28245. -
Is this maths trick helpful? (888) (374)
**Post / Read comment (0)**

## Multiplication of 999 with any number (You can\'t use this rule for other numbers)

### Let me explain this rule by taking examples

1. 51*999 = 51*(1000-1) = 51*1000-51 = 51000-51 = 50949.

2. 147*999 = 147*(1000-1) = 147000-147 = 146853.-
## Example.

Understand the rule by 1 more example

3825*999 = 3825*(1000-1) = 3825000-3825 = 3821175 -
Is this maths trick helpful? (892) (324)
**Post / Read comment (0)**

## Multiplication of 99 with any number (You can't use this rule for other numbers)

### Let me explain this rule by taking examples

1. 46*99 = 46*(100-1) = 46*100-46 = 4600-46 = 4554.

2. 362*99 = 362*(100-1) = 36200-362 = 35838.-
## Example.

Example.

Understand the rule by 1 more example

2841*99 = 2841*(100-1) = 284100-2841 = 281259 -
Is this maths trick helpful? (775) (280)
**Post / Read comment (1)**

## Multiplication of 99 with any number (You can't use this rule for other numbers)

### Let me explain this rule by taking examples

1. 46*99 = 46*(100-1) = 46*100-46 = 4600-46 = 4554.

2. 362*99 = 362*(100-1) = 36200-362 = 35838.-
## Example.

Example.

Understand the rule by 1 more example

2841*99 = 2841*(100-1) = 284100-2841 = 281259 -
Is this maths trick helpful? (717) (259)
**Post / Read comment (0)**

## Multiplication of 9 with any number (You can't use this rule for other numbers)

### Let me explain this rule by taking examples

1. 18*9 = 18*(10-1) = 18*10-18 = 180-18 = 162.

2. 187*9 = 187*(10-1) = 1870-187 = 1683.-
## Example.

Example.

Understand the rule by 1 more example

1864*9 = 1864*(10-1) = 18640-1864 = 16776 -
Is this maths trick helpful? (842) (286)
**Post / Read comment (0)**

## Multiplication of 11 with any number. (You can't use this rule for other numbers)

### Let me explain this rule by taking examples

1) 234163*11 = 2---2+3---3+4---4+1---1+6---6+3---3 = 2575793

Means insert the sum of 2 successive digits and put 2 terminal digits in its place

2) 45345181*11 = 4---4+5---5+3---3+4---4+5---5+1---1+8---8+1---1 = 498796991-
## Example.

Here an extra case arises

Consider the following examples for that

3) 473927*11 = 4+1--- (4+7-10) +1--- (7+3-10) +1--- (3+9-10) +1--- (9+2-10)--- (2+7) ---7 = 5213197

4) 584536*11 = 5+1---(5+8-10)+1---(8+4-10)---(4+5)---(5+3)---(3+6)---6 = 6429896 -
Is this maths trick helpful? (1380) (651)
**Post / Read comment (8)**

Vinay Sipani

India

Karnataka

Time: 00:00:21

Points

20

Arithmetic is numbers you squeeze from your head to your hand to your pencil to your paper till you get the answer

Carl Sandburg"The study of mathematics, like the Nile, begins in minuteness but ends in magnificence"

Charles caleb cottonThanks a lot m4maths...I got placed in Accenture because of the practice papers here.Thank you very much

Sowmya Raman 3 Days agoRecently i got selected in TCS.thanx m4 maths for valuble contribution in my prepration.50% questions in the paper are directly asked from m4 maths.before test,at least go through first 20 pages.and prepared well for ur mini project,because most of t

Gauutam gaurav 11 Days ago
maths tricks mathematics tricks math tricks maths trick math trick m4maths maths short tricks maths shortcut tricks mathematical tricks tricks of mathematics tricks of maths quicker math tricks maths tricks in hindi language tricks in maths m4maths.com maths tricks for fast calculation short tricks for maths maths trics mathematics trick math short tricks trick of maths maths calculation tricks math tricks in hindi iit maths tricks maths shortcut formulas math short trick mathematics short tricks maths short tricks in hindi maths triks short tricks to solve math problems shortcut math tricks tricks in mathematics trick math math trics mathematics tricks of calculation tricks to solve maths maths tricks in hindi tricks for mathematics trick of math short tricks of maths short tricks short cut tricks for maths please give me short tricks of maths maths shortcut mathematical trick math trick in hindi easy maths tricks mathstrick short math tricks in hindi short maths tricks